Global Patent Index - EP 0948181 A3

EP 0948181 A3 2000-05-10 - Method for creating and modifying similar and dissimilar databases for use in operator services configurations for telecommunication system

Title (en)

Method for creating and modifying similar and dissimilar databases for use in operator services configurations for telecommunication system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung und Modifizierung von ähnlichen und unterschiedlichen Datenbanken für Vermittlungsdienstenkonfigurationen für ein Telekommunikationssystem

Title (fr)

Méthode pour créer er modifier des bases de données similaires et dissimilaires pour utilisation dans des configurations de service d'opérateur pour un système de télécommunication

Publication

EP 0948181 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302439 A

Priority

US 5420698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948181A2] This invention uses a computer program to mine preexisting operator services configuration data located in a variety of preexisting source operator services configuration databases. The computer program either creates a new operator services configuration database from parts of existing operator services configuration databases or modifies an existing operator services configuration database. The computer program replaces the current system=s reliance upon manual data entry by data engineers to configure the operation of a new telecommunication switch or replace the software in a telecommunication switch that was damaged or requires a new operator services configuration data configuration. This invention provides accurate and timely customer information, significantly decreases the time interval for engineering a new operator services configuration database, decreases the research and data entry time, decreases the interval for lab planning and project management, improves operator services configuration database integrity, provides a cleaner operator services configuration database, reuses existing operator services configuration data eliminating double data entry, reuses some existing software code, and uses preexisting office data administration tools and provides a platform for future growth and expandability. By accomplishing these tasks, the telecommunication switch manufacturer or telecommunication switch operator saves time, money and decreases time-to-market product and service schedules. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/42; H04M 3/22; H04Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/545 (2006.01); H04M 3/00 (2006.01); H04M 3/22 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04Q 3/76 (2006.01); H04M 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42144 (2013.01); H04Q 3/54533 (2013.01); H04M 2203/558 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99933 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99945 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99948 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99953 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5414812 A 19950509 - FILIP MICHAEL J [US], et al
  • [A] US 5274802 A 19931228 - ALTINE PHILLIP [US]
  • [A] WO 9625715 A1 19960822 - BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al
  • [A] US 5625804 A 19970429 - COOPER RONALD C [US], et al
  • [A] VENKATRAMAN B R: "SUBSCRIBER PROFILE MANAGER: A CUSTOMER NETWORK MANAGEMENT TOOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. SYMP. 4, 14 February 1994 (1994-02-14), pages 153 - 162, XP000452404, ISBN: 0-7803-1812-9
  • [A] ZITZEN W: "INTEGRIERTES NETZMANAGEMENT FUR CAMPUS- UND WEITVERKEHRSNETZ", NTZ NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, vol. 48, no. 8, August 1995 (1995-08-01), pages 12 - 15, XP000525353, ISSN: 0027-707X
  • [A] COX W V: "THE FLEXCOM TM/LINC SYSTEM: A CUSTOMER NETWORK RECONFIGURATION SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION(GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. 1, 2 December 1990 (1990-12-02) - 5 December 1990 (1990-12-05), pages 72 - 75, XP000218699, ISBN: 0-87942-632-2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948181 A2 19991006; EP 0948181 A3 20000510; EP 0948181 B1 20130123; JP 2000032512 A 20000128; JP 2007312423 A 20071129; JP 4015316 B2 20071128; JP 4833165 B2 20111207; US 6243712 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RG

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-02-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69944595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131024

2014-01-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-11-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-09-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130829 AND 20130904

2013-03-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 69944595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130321

2013-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2012-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04Q 3/545 20060101AFI20120614BHEP

2012-06-14 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 69944595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04M0003420000

- IPC: H04Q0003545000

2009-09-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050422

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04M 3/42 A, 7H 04M 3/22 B, 7H 04Q 3/00 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI