Global Patent Index - EP 0948287 A4

EP 0948287 A4 2001-02-14 - URINARY INCONTINENCE DEVICE

Title (en)

URINARY INCONTINENCE DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI HARN-INKONTINENZ

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR INCONTINENCE URINAIRE

Publication

EP 0948287 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96942970 A

Priority

US 9619949 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9825524A1] A device (10) for managing urinary incontinence comprises a resilient body that engages the external genitalia and sealingly occludes the urethral meatus. In female embodiments, the body (12) fits between the labia minora (40) and the floor of the vulval vestibule (34), occluding the meatus (38). An adhesive (22) on the body (12) sealingly engages with the meatus (38). In one female embodiment, the body has a base (14) with an adhesive layer (22) that seats against the vestibule floor (34). A pair of flexible, lateral flaps (18) engage the labia minora (40). A layer of super-absorbent material (62) may be situated between the base (72) and the adhesive layer (92), and/or a layer of scrim material (90) may be so situated. The body (70) may have a longitudinal ridge (74) with a posterior edge (16) having a finger hole (76) to facilitate installation and removal. Several alternative female embodiments are also provided. In male embodiments, the device includes a resilient pad (122) with adhesive (128) on one surface. The pad (122) conforms and adhesively attaches to the penile glans (130), with the adhesive (128) sealingly occluding the meatus. Securing tabs (126) may be provided to adhere to the glans (130) or penile shaft (132).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/00; A61F 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 5/37 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/47209 (2013.01); A61F 2/0009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9825524 A1 19980618; AU 1152297 A 19980703; AU 728736 B2 20010118; CA 2274815 A1 19980618; EP 0948287 A1 19991013; EP 0948287 A4 20010214; JP 2001505797 A 20010508; KR 20000057558 A 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20070305

2005-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040827

2001-02-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61B 17/00 A, 7A 61F 2/00 B

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE