Global Patent Index - EP 0948409 A4

EP 0948409 A4 2001-12-05 - APPARATUS FOR MULTI-WELL MICROSCALE SYNTHESIS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR MULTI-WELL MICROSCALE SYNTHESIS

Title (de)

MEHRGEFÄSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SYNTHESE IM MIKROMASSSTAB

Title (fr)

APPAREIL MULTIPUITS POUR SYNTHESE A PETITE ECHELLE

Publication

EP 0948409 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97950641 A

Priority

  • US 9721228 W
  • US 3102496 P
  • US 4321197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9822219A1] A multi-well synthesis and filtration apparatus (10) for performing multiple, simultaneous chemical reactions, workups and purifications on a micro scale. The apparatus (10) includes a deep-well synthesis block (12) having a plurality of wells (24) fitted with filter disks (48), an upper cover (14), a lower cover (16) and a pair of sheet gaskets (18 and 20). The sheet gaskets (18 and 20) are interposed between the upper and lower covers (14 and 16) to seal inlet portions (38) and outlet spouts (40) of the wells (24). Apertures (70) in the upper cover (14) provide that the sheet gasket (18) may be punctured for introduction of materials and/or maintenance of an inert atmosphere. The design is such that either the synthesis block (12) alone, or the block (12) as covered, is dimensionally of a size that provides for a footprint that is the same as a standard microplate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 19/00; B01L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C40B 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/5025 (2013.01); B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01L 3/50255 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00286 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00313 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00319 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00335 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00416 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00423 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); C40B 60/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9822219 A1 19980528; AU 5359398 A 19980610; EP 0948409 A1 19991013; EP 0948409 A4 20011205; GB 2322570 A 19980902; GB 2322570 B 20001115; GB 9812156 D0 19980805; JP 2000507502 A 20000620; JP 3338961 B2 20021028

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01J 19/00 A, 7B 01L 3/00 B

1999-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROBBINS, PAUL, B.

1999-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STANCHFIELD, JAMES, E.

1999-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAILEY, CHRIS, N.

1999-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WRIGHT, DAVID, J.

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990610

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE