Global Patent Index - EP 0948583 B1

EP 0948583 B1 2001-01-24 - METHOD OF GASIFYING SOLID FUELS IN A CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED

Title (en)

METHOD OF GASIFYING SOLID FUELS IN A CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERGASEN FESTER BRENNSTOFFE IN DER ZIRKULIERENDEN WIRBELSCHICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GAZEIFICATION DE COMBUSTIBLES SOLIDES DANS UN LIT FLUIDISE EN CIRCULATION

Publication

EP 0948583 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952838 A

Priority

  • DE 19652770 A
  • EP 9706716 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652770A1] Combustible fuels, for example waste substances, biomass or coal, are gasified in a circulating fluidized bed with the addition of oxygenous gas at temperatures ranging from 700 to 1000 DEG C. A fuel gas is obtained which contains dust and hydrocarbons, including higher hydrocarbons (C6+ hydrocarbons), and has a calorific value of between 2000 and 8000 kJ/m<3>. The dust-laden gas is passed through a separation chamber in which the higher hydrocarbons present in the gas are largely separated by the addition of gaseous oxygen at temperatures ranging from 800 to 1200 DEG C and below the temperature of the ash melting point. The content of C6+ hydrocarbons present in the gas emerging from the separation chamber is at most 10 wt % of the initial content. The gas from the separation chamber is cooled and dedusted and passed through at least one bed or at least one reactor with granular solids which bind with pollutants. The gas-purification process is carried out without forming waste water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/84; C10J 3/54; C10J 3/62; C10J 3/64; C10J 3/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09B 3/00 (2006.01); C10B 53/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/46 (2006.01); C10J 3/54 (2006.01); C10J 3/62 (2006.01); C10J 3/64 (2006.01); C10J 3/66 (2006.01); C10J 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/66 (2013.01); C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10J 3/62 (2013.01); C10J 3/64 (2013.01); C10J 3/84 (2013.01); C10K 3/008 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652770 A1 19980625; AU 5657598 A 19980715; AU 722068 B2 20000720; BR 9714421 A 20000502; CA 2275646 A1 19980625; EP 0948583 A1 19991013; EP 0948583 B1 20010124; ES 2155270 T3 20010501; JP 2001506288 A 20010515; WO 9827182 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021202

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155270 T3

2001-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702967 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991209

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL