Global patent index - EP 0948586 A4

EP 0948586 A4 2000-02-23 - POLYOL ESTER FUELS ADDITIVE

Title (en)

POLYOL ESTER FUELS ADDITIVE

Title (de)

TREIBSTOFFZUSATZ AUF BASIS VON POLYOLESTER

Title (fr)

ADDITIF POUR COMBUSTIBLES A BASE D'ESTER DE POLYALCOOL

Publication

EP 0948586 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97942478 A

Priority

  • US 9716329 W
  • US 71299196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811177A1] A polyol ester fuel additive exhibits reduced intake valve deposits and combustion chamber deposits. The ester has between about 1 % and about 35 % unconverted hydroxyl groups and is characterized as having an hydroxyl number from about 5 to about 180.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/18; C10L 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/19 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 10/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 10/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811177 A1 19980319; AU 4416697 A 19980402; AU 734585 B2 20010614; BR 9711783 A 19990824; CA 2264707 A1 19980319; CN 1230210 A 19990929; EP 0948586 A1 19991013; EP 0948586 A4 20000223; JP 2001501231 A 20010130

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020823

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 10L 1/18 A, 7C 10L 10/00 B

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL