Global Patent Index - EP 0948645 A4

EP 0948645 A4 2002-11-05 - CLEAVED AMPLIFIED RFLP DETECTION METHODS

Title (en)

CLEAVED AMPLIFIED RFLP DETECTION METHODS

Title (de)

ERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN DURCH RESTRIKTIONSFRAGMENTLÄNGENPOLYMORPHISMEN (RFLP)

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE DETECTION DES FRAGMENTS DE RESTRICTION POLYMORPHES (RFPL) AMPLIFIES ET CLIVES

Publication

EP 0948645 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97942525 A

Priority

  • US 9716467 W
  • US 71548496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812352A1] The invention features methods for detecting polymorphic restriction sites in nucleic acids and kits for carrying out these methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12P 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/683 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6858 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/683 + C12Q 2565/518 + C12Q 2525/191 + C12Q 2531/113
  2. C12Q 1/6858 + C12Q 2565/518 + C12Q 2525/191

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9525538 A1 19950928 - GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 8910414 A1 19891102 - WALLACE ROBERT BRUCE [US], et al
  • [Y] UGOZZOLI L: "DETECTION OF SPECIFIC ALLELES BY USING ALLELE-SPECIFIC PRIMER EXTENSION FOLLOWED BY CAPTURE ON SOLID SUPPORT", GENETIC ANALYSIS TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, vol. 9, no. 4, 1 August 1992 (1992-08-01), pages 107 - 112, XP000330552, ISSN: 1050-3862
  • [Y] NAIF H M ET AL: "EARLY DETECTION OF BOVINE LEUKEMIA VIRUS BY USING AN ENZYME-LINKED ASSAY FOR POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION-AMPLIFIED PROVIRAL DNA IN EXPERIMENTALLY INFECTED CATTLE", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 30, no. 3, March 1992 (1992-03-01), pages 675 - 679, XP002917080, ISSN: 0095-1137
  • See also references of WO 9812352A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812352 A1 19980326; CA 2266750 A1 19980326; EP 0948645 A1 19991013; EP 0948645 A4 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-11-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-27 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB