Global Patent Index - EP 0948711 B1

EP 0948711 B1 2002-11-27 - SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE RICHNESS OF AN INJECTION THERMAL ENGINE WITH ADAPTIVE RICHNESS REFERENCE INPUT

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE RICHNESS OF AN INJECTION THERMAL ENGINE WITH ADAPTIVE RICHNESS REFERENCE INPUT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM REGELN DES KRAFSTOFF/LUFT -VERHALTNISSES EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ADAPTIVERKRAFSTOFF/LUFT -VERHALTNIS-SOLLWERT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA RICHESSE D'UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE A INJECTION AVEC CONSIGNE DE RICHESSE ADAPTATIVE

Publication

EP 0948711 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97912271 A

Priority

  • FR 9701931 W
  • FR 9613369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2755184A1] The invention concerns a system for regulating the richness of the air-fuel mixture in a controlled injection thermal engine, consisting of a fast regulating loop comprising a Smith predictor and by a slow regulating loop adapting the reference input richness to the instability phenomena of engine torque estimated at each outer dead center on the basis of the respective torque values at previous outer dead centers computed by a software torquemeter. It works out an estimator of instability phenomena invariant to transient phases and to cylinders, and comprises an expert system for determining the heuristic reference input richness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 41/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/1401 (2013.01); F02D 41/1475 (2013.01); F02D 41/1479 (2013.01); F02D 41/1486 (2013.01); F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1409 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1426 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1433 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); F02D 2250/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2755184 A1 19980430; FR 2755184 B1 19990115; AU 4952597 A 19980522; DE 69717491 D1 20030109; DE 69717491 T2 20030724; EP 0948711 A1 19991013; EP 0948711 B1 20021127; WO 9819062 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717491

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717491 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT