Global Patent Index - EP 0948730 B1

EP 0948730 B1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMPRESSED NITROGEN

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMPRESSED NITROGEN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG VON DRUCKSTICKSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AZOTE COMPRIME

Publication

EP 0948730 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948844 A

Priority

  • EP 97948844 A
  • DE 19643916 A
  • DE 19717124 A
  • DE 19735154 A
  • EP 9706010 W
  • EP 97102533 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819122A1] The present invention concerns a method and device for producing compressed nitrogen by air classification at a low temperature in a rectifying apparatus presenting a pressure column (4) and a low pressure column (5). The air used (1, 3) is introduced in the pressure column (4). A liquid fraction containing oxygen is taken from the pressure column (4) and introduced in the low pressure column (5). The gas nitrogen (18) from the low pressure column (5) is condensed, at least partially, in a head capacitor through indirect heat transfer using an evaporating liquid (13). In order for the nitrogen from the pressure column to be obtained in the form of a compressed gas (24, 24, 29), a pressure is used which is higher than that needed for the operation of the low pressure column (5). The nitrogen (20) bleed from the low pressure column is exposed in that liquid state to a pressure higher than that of the low pressure column (5). The liquid (22) put under pressure is evaporated in an evaporator (23) through direct heat transfer involving a heat carrier (35), which produces a gaseous compressed nitrogen (24, 25, 29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04212 (2013.01); F25J 3/04084 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04103 (2013.01); F25J 3/04224 (2013.01); F25J 3/0423 (2013.01); F25J 3/04236 (2013.01); F25J 3/04284 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04321 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04418 (2013.01); F25J 3/04424 (2013.01); F25J 3/04872 (2013.01); F25J 3/04878 (2013.01); F25J 3/04884 (2013.01); F25J 2200/52 (2013.01); F25J 2200/54 (2013.01); F25J 2200/90 (2013.01); F25J 2235/02 (2013.01); F25J 2235/42 (2013.01); F25J 2245/42 (2013.01); F25J 2245/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/04 (2013.01); F25J 2250/10 (2013.01); F25J 2250/20 (2013.01); F25J 2250/42 (2013.01); F25J 2250/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819122 A1 19980507; CA 2277838 A1 19980507; CN 1235666 A 19991117; DE 19735154 A1 19980507; DE 59702301 D1 20001005; DK 0948730 T3 20001016; EP 0948730 A1 19991013; EP 0948730 B1 20000830; ES 2150291 T3 20001116; JP 2001509246 A 20010710; KR 20000052974 A 20000825; PT 948730 E 20001229; US 6196023 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-08-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051030

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2005-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2005-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2005-10-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2004-11-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150291 T3

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702301 20001005

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-09-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT PT SE

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CORDUAN, HORST

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTTMANN, DIETRICH

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOIT, JUERGEN

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUNZ, CHRISTIAN

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAAG, WOLFGANG

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT PT SE