Global Patent Index - EP 0948801 B1

EP 0948801 B1 2002-11-20 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRON GUN COMPRISING A SEMICONDUCTOR CATHODE

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRON GUN COMPRISING A SEMICONDUCTOR CATHODE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONENKANONE MIT HALBLEITERKATHODE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CANON ELECTRONIQUE MUNI D'UNE CATHODE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 0948801 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936625 A

Priority

  • EP 98936625 A
  • EP 97202977 A
  • IB 9801279 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917326A1] During production of an electron gun, and prior to assembly of the gun, the surface of the cathode is cleaned in a clean room and provided with a protective layer of oxide. A protective layer having substantially no contaminations is provided in this way. The oxide layer is removed again after the assembly and before the cathode ray tube is vacuum-exhausted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 9/18 (2006.01); H01J 9/38 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/38 (2013.01); H01J 29/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917326 A1 19990408; DE 69809534 D1 20030102; DE 69809534 T2 20030821; EP 0948801 A1 19991013; EP 0948801 B1 20021120; JP 2001508931 A 20010703; KR 20000069169 A 20001125

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-01 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-26 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809534 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL