Global Patent Index - EP 0948910 A3

EP 0948910 A3 2000-04-12 - A snowboard boot having an asymmetrical support member

Title (en)

A snowboard boot having an asymmetrical support member

Title (de)

Snowboard-Stiefel mit einer asymmetrischen Stütze

Title (fr)

Botte de "snowboard" ayant une pièce de support asymétrique

Publication

EP 0948910 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104781 A

Priority

US 3962398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948910A2] The present invention relates to a snowboard boot having a support member 11 that is asymmetrical. The support member 11 has inner and outer sides, each side having an upper 21, 26 and a lower 22, 27 portion. The outer side is generally larger than the inner side. The inner side includes a strap portion 30 which extends within the boot from the upper portion 21 to the lower portion 22 of the inner side. The configuration of the strap portion 30 and the support member 11 provides the boot with rigidity in response to forces due to leaning toward the outer side of the boot and flexibility in response to leaning toward the inner side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/19; A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 7/20 (2006.01); A63C 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/1495 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948910 A2 19991013; EP 0948910 A3 20000412; EP 0948910 B1 20030917; DE 69911288 D1 20031023; DE 69911288 T2 20040408; JP H11313704 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060310

2005-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911288 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021031

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 43B 7/19 A, 7A 43B 5/04 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI