Global Patent Index - EP 0949021 B1

EP 0949021 B1 2001-12-19 - Device for the forming of wire, with a wire braking device

Title (en)

Device for the forming of wire, with a wire braking device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Formen von Draht, mit einer Drahtbremseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le formage de fil ayant un dispositif de freinage de fil

Publication

EP 0949021 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105833 A

Priority

DE 19816403 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949021A2] Wire (18) is drawn through a guide (10) and held in a clamp (52) for cutting by a blade (100). The friction is controlled by a compression spring (126) and prismatic bolt (128) adjusted by a lever (124) and rod (116) attached to a ring (130) slidably positioned by a lever (114). A programmably controlled drive (152) controls the braking force, and the movement in the wire direction is controlled by the programming of the tools.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/008 (2013.01); B21F 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949021 A2 19991013; EP 0949021 A3 20010117; EP 0949021 B1 20011219; DE 19816403 A1 19991021; DE 19816403 C2 20010613; US 6092565 A 20000725; US 6397900 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060323

2005-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900566 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI