Global Patent Index - EP 0949064 A3

EP 0949064 A3 2001-12-05 - Assembly of pressure plates for joining sheets of material, each comprising at least one flat sheet and/or at least one corrugated sheet and a corrugated sheet

Title (en)

Assembly of pressure plates for joining sheets of material, each comprising at least one flat sheet and/or at least one corrugated sheet and a corrugated sheet

Title (de)

Druckplattenanlage zum Verbinden von mehreren Materialbahnen - wovon jede mindestens eine flache Bahn und/oder mindestens eine gewölbte Bahn umfasst- zur Wellpappe

Title (fr)

Arrangement de plaques de pression pour joindre une pluralité de bandes de matière, chacune comportant au moins une bande lisse ou/et au moins une bande ondulée, en bande de carton ondulé

Publication

EP 0949064 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99106722 A

Priority

DE 19815863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949064A2] The joining of several smooth and corrugated strips into a corrugated cardboard strip (P), with glue being applied to one of the strips, is carried out by a pressure unit (14). This unit is fitted with a pressure plate (22) and a heated counter pressure plate (26). The strips of material to be joined are passed between the two plates. The pressure unit, with its pressure plate, can be brought towards or away from the counter pressure plate. The pressure plate can also be heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/2881 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1016 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949064 A2 19991013; EP 0949064 A3 20011205; DE 19815863 A1 19991014; US 6257296 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BHS CORRUGATED MASCHINEN-UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI