Global Patent Index - EP 0949074 B1

EP 0949074 B1 2001-05-30 - Ink rail seal

Title (en)

Ink rail seal

Title (de)

Dichtung für Kammerrakel

Title (fr)

Joint pour chambre de racle

Publication

EP 0949074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101431 A

Priority

EP 98101431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949074A1] The seal has a sealing block (30) of yielding material, fitted at one end of the chamber doctor between two doctor knives (16,18), enclosing an ink chamber between the circumference of an application roll (10), the doctor knives and their casing (14). A strip (34) of elastic material, harder than that of the sealing block, sits on the surface facing the application roll.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949074 A1 19991013; EP 0949074 B1 20010530; DE 59800788 D1 20010705; JP H11254650 A 19990921; US 6016748 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800788

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800788 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980729

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI