Global patent index - EP 0949080 A3

EP 0949080 A3 2000-01-26 - Ink container with improved sealing of ink container outlet port

Title (en)

Ink container with improved sealing of ink container outlet port

Title (de)

Tintenbehälter mit verbesserter Auslassöffnungsdichtung

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'encre à moyens d'étanchéité perfectionné pour orifice de sortie

Publication

EP 0949080 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301352 A

Priority

US 5603198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949080A2] An ink container (16) has improved sealing properties within an ink outlet port (40). The ink port has a flexible polypropylene ring (42) inserted within the port. Upon insertion of a manifold ink pipe (56A) into the port (40), the ring (42) is extruded around the annulus of the pipe (56A) and provides an effective seal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17523 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949080 A2 19991013; EP 0949080 A3 20000126; BR 9902032 A 20000118; JP H11320906 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020723

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI