Global Patent Index - EP 0949085 A3

EP 0949085 A3 2000-08-02 - Thermal transfer printing on plastics materials

Title (en)

Thermal transfer printing on plastics materials

Title (de)

Thermischer Übertragungsdruck auf Kunststoffmaterialien

Title (fr)

Impression par transfert thermique sur des matières en plastique

Publication

EP 0949085 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302731 A

Priority

GB 9807436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949085A2] A printed marking on a plastics substrate has a first, sub-surface portion of a first pigmentation material bound to, or penetrated into the substrate, and a second, surface portion of a second pigmentation material adhered to the surface of the substrate overlaying the sub-surface portion of the mark. The dual nature of the marking provides advantages in terms of durability, particularly for use in harsh environments , or situations where the mark is liable to be subject to chemical action, or abrasion in the normal course of events or in cases of unauthorised tampering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/38; B41M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41M 5/035 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/385 (2006.01); B41M 5/392 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/38207 (2013.01); B41J 3/407 (2013.01); B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B41M 5/035 (2013.01); B41M 5/0356 (2013.01); B41M 5/385 (2013.01); B41M 5/392 (2013.01); B41M 5/465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949085 A2 19991013; EP 0949085 A3 20000802; CA 2268367 A1 19991007; GB 2336218 A8 19991101; GB 2336218 A 19991013; GB 9807436 D0 19980603; SG 85635 A1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031027

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41M 5/38 A, 7B 41M 3/14 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI