Global Patent Index - EP 0949150 A3

EP 0949150 A3 2000-05-03 - Container for freeze-drying and storing medical products

Title (en)

Container for freeze-drying and storing medical products

Title (de)

Behälter zur Gefriertrocknung und Aufbewahrung medizinischer Produkte

Title (fr)

Récipient pour la lyophilisation et le conditionnement de produits médicaux

Publication

EP 0949150 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106729 A

Priority

DE 19815993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949150A2] The container comprises a body and a cylindrical neck and head section. The container consists of a transluscent or transparent plastics material and the body has planar sides, for an even contact with adjacent containers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02; F26B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/06 (2013.01); B65D 1/0223 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949150 A2 19991013; EP 0949150 A3 20000503; DE 19815993 A1 19991014; DE 19815993 C2 20030306; US 2002081408 A1 20020627

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-08-09 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 1/02 A, 7F 26B 5/06 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI