Global Patent Index - EP 0949151 A3

EP 0949151 A3 2000-05-10 - Tubular carton as well as method and apparatus for manufacturing the carton

Title (en)

Tubular carton as well as method and apparatus for manufacturing the carton

Title (de)

Rohrförmige Kartonverpackung sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung der Verpackung

Title (fr)

Boîte en carton tubulaire ainsi que procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0949151 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302458 A

Priority

GB 9806794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949151A2] The present invention relates to cartons, methods of constructing cartons and to blanks (2) for cartons. The present invention also relates to apparatus for manufacturing cartons from carton blanks. The present invention provides a tubular carton comprising at least two layers (4,6,8), characterised in that the carton wall is of substantially even thickness along the length thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 3/22; B31C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 3/22 (2013.01); B31F 7/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949151 A2 19991013; EP 0949151 A3 20000510; GB 9806794 D0 19980527

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI