Global Patent Index - EP 0949160 B1

EP 0949160 B1 2001-03-14 - Packaging means for protecting articles against shock

Title (en)

Packaging means for protecting articles against shock

Title (de)

Verpackungsmittel zum Schutz von Gegenständen gegen Stösse

Title (fr)

Moyens d'emballage pour des articles contre les chocs

Publication

EP 0949160 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98106385 A

Priority

EP 98106385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949160A1] In packaging means of the kind comprising an outer box (11) and shells (12,13) made from moulded pulp for supporting and protecting an article within them, an important novel feature is that the shells (12,13) are interconnected by a cardboard piece (14) folded or cut from a cardboard sheet material. With this arrangement, both lateral and vertical support for the article can be provided by using pulp shells (12,13) of smaller dimensions than would otherwise be necessary. By combining moulded pulp shells with cardboard objects, a rigid unit capable of supporting and protecting the packed article is obtained. The well known shock absorbing quality of the moulded pulp article is combined with the stiffeners of the folded cardboard in a way which adds the good qualities of both materials in a way resulting in a better total packaging. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/133

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/133 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/133 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 1977160 A 19341016 - WHITE RONALD D

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949160 A1 19991013; EP 0949160 B1 20010314; AU 3025299 A 19991101; DE 69800594 D1 20010419; DE 69800594 T2 20010628; WO 9952789 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 4

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030408

2002-03-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800594

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-07-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2000-06-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000413;LT PAYMENT 20000413;LV PAYMENT 20000413;RO PAYMENT 20000413;SI PAYMENT 20000413

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990420

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990123

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI