Global patent index - EP 0949172 B1

EP 0949172 B1 2001-03-21 - Improved apparatus for rolling up compressible fibrous materials

Title (en)

Improved apparatus for rolling up compressible fibrous materials

Title (de)

Apparat zum Aufrollen von zusammenpressbaren Faserstoffmaterialien

Title (fr)

Appareil pour enrouler des matériaux fibreux compressibles

Publication

EP 0949172 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830212 A

Priority

EP 98830212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949172A1] An improved apparatus for rolling up compressible fibrous materials has been devised in which a conveyor member (2) carries a ribbon of compressible fibrous material to be coiled up (4). A deflection member (3) cooperating with the conveyor member defines a solid angle ( gamma ) therewith. A restricting member (5) moved by drive means operates at the solid angle ( gamma ) between the conveyor member and the deflection member to define a rolling-up space (6) with them. Detecting means (12) generates a signal (13) proportional to a reaction load transmitted by the roll being wound and a control unit (14) active on the drive means (7) varies the displacement speed (Vs) of the restricting member (5), depending on the signal (13) generated by the detecting means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/22; B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/22 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/22 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4138 (2013.01); B65H 2404/434 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2515/30 (2013.01); B65H 2701/177 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1846 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1922 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  3. B65H 2515/30 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949172 A1 19991013; EP 0949172 B1 20010321; DE 69800627 D1 20010426; DE 69800627 T2 20011115; ES 2157651 T3 20010816

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030408

2004-04-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-04-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-04-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157651

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800627

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHINT COMPAGNIA TECNICA INTERNAZIONALE S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI