Global Patent Index - EP 0949183 A3

EP 0949183 A3 2002-11-13 - Travelling gear, in particular for lifting devices and suspended loads

Title (en)

Travelling gear, in particular for lifting devices and suspended loads

Title (de)

Fahrwerk, insbesondere für Hebezeuge und hängende Lasten

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de translation, en particulier pour appareils de levage et charges suspendues

Publication

EP 0949183 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250093 A

Priority

DE 19816573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949183A2] The carriage is driven along a rail (1) by a wheel (7) rotated through a worm drive (7b) by a direct current electric motor (7a). The rate of increase of the motor torque and the motor voltage during startup is then compared with the driving torque and motor voltage to initiate braking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 9/18; B66C 9/14; B66C 11/06; B66C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 11/06 (2006.01); B66C 9/14 (2006.01); B66C 9/18 (2006.01); B66C 13/06 (2006.01); B66C 13/22 (2006.01); B66C 13/24 (2006.01); H02K 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/14 (2013.01); B66C 9/18 (2013.01); B66C 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949183 A2 19991013; EP 0949183 A3 20021113; EP 0949183 B1 20040121; DE 59908337 D1 20040226; JP 2000086152 A 20000328; KR 19990082964 A 19991125; US 6153992 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-06 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/03 PAGES: 237 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE.

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908337 P 20040226

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI