Global Patent Index - EP 0949194 A3

EP 0949194 A3 2000-10-18 - Telescopic jib for work platforms

Title (en)

Telescopic jib for work platforms

Title (de)

Teleskopausleger für Hubarbeitsbühnen

Title (fr)

Flèche télescopique pour plate-formes de travail

Publication

EP 0949194 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111555 A

Priority

DE 29806602 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949194A2] The outer telescopic support(12) and at least the two outermost supports(14,16) of the inner telescopic group(14,16,18) are in functional communication by a single double-acting and at least two-stage telescopic cylinder(36) located inside the jib. The sequence of the telescopic extension of the outer support and inner telescopic group is controlled by the telescopic cylinder dependent upon load. The cylinder has at least a first(38) and a second(40) stage which can be extended independently of each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/70 (2006.01); B66F 11/04 (2006.01); F15B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/701 (2013.01); B66F 11/046 (2013.01); F15B 15/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806602 U1 19990512; EP 0949194 A2 19991013; EP 0949194 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI