Global Patent Index - EP 0949225 B1

EP 0949225 B1 2002-11-20 - Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (en)

Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (de)

Azidfreie, gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition génératrice de gaz exempt d'azoture

Publication

EP 0949225 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105181 A

Priority

DE 29806504 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949225A1] Azide-free gas generating composition, especially for use in vehicle safety equipment, contains 20-60 wt.% fuel mixture of NOTLESS 2 components and 40-80 wt.% oxidant mixture of NOTLESS 3 components. The fuel mixture comprises 5-95 wt.% guanidine compound (I), 95-5 wt.% heterocyclic organic acid (II) and 0-20 wt.% other fuel; and the oxidant mixture comprises 20-70 wt.% transition metal oxide(s) (III), 10-50 wt.% basic copper (Cu) nitrate (IV) and 2-30 wt.% metal (per)chlorate, ammonium perchlorate and/or alkali(ne earth) nitrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 29/02 (2006.01); C06B 43/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/14 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806504 U1 19980806; EP 0949225 A1 19991013; EP 0949225 B1 20021120; JP H11343192 A 19991214; US 6132537 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-02-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-02-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903442 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR NL SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI