Global Patent Index - EP 0949320 A3

EP 0949320 A3 2000-09-06 - Lubrifcating compositions

Title (en)

Lubrifcating compositions

Title (de)

Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions lubrifiantes

Publication

EP 0949320 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302498 A

Priority

GB 9807843 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949320A2] Use of at least one friction modifier to reduce micropitting of a metal surface, which comprises lubricating the metal surface with a lubricant composition comprising the at least one friction modifier, wherein the at least one friction modifier is selected such that micropitting is reduced when the metal surface is so lubricated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 137/12; C10M 141/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/40 (2006.01); C10M 133/16 (2006.01); C10M 137/02 (2006.01); C10M 137/12 (2006.01); C10M 141/08 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10M 141/12 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/12 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/16 (2013.01); C10M 129/40 (2013.01); C10M 137/02 (2013.01); C10M 137/12 (2013.01); C10M 141/08 (2013.01); C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/065 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0450208 A1 19911009 - ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD [GB]
  • [A] EP 0753564 A1 19970115 - LUBRIZOL CORP [US]
  • [XY] WO 9424233 A1 19941027 - ETHYL CORP [US]
  • [XP] EP 0892037 A1 19990120 - ETHYL CORP [US]
  • [Y] HONG ET AL: "Evaluation of Surface fatigue Perfomance of Gear Oils", TECHNISCHE AKADEMIE ESSLINGEN 10TH INTERNATIONAL "TRIBOLOGY - SOLVING FRICTION AND WEAR PROBLEMS" COLLOQUIM PROCEEDINGS, vol. 2, 1996, Esslingen, pages 1399 - 1411, XP002141636
  • [Y] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 2, 11 January 1982, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 10163b, XP002141637 & SHOTTER, B. A (WESTLAND HELICOPTERS LTD): "Micropitting: its characteristics and implications on the test requirements of gear oils", PROC. INST. PET., no. 1, 1981, London, pages 91 - 103SHOTTER, B. A (WESTLAND HELICOPTERS LTD)Micropitting: its characteristics and implications on the test requirements of gear oilsPROC. INST. PET.London1981191103

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949320 A2 19991013; EP 0949320 A3 20000906; CA 2266841 A1 19991009; CA 2266841 C 20080729; CN 1214094 C 20050810; CN 1234430 A 19991110; GB 9807843 D0 19980610; JP 3200044 B2 20010820; JP H11323366 A 19991126; SG 77676 A1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081211

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 129/40 20060101AFI20080624BHEP

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 141/08 20060101ALI20080624BHEP

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 10/12 20060101ALN20080624BHEP

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 30/06 20060101ALN20080624BHEP

2008-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/00 20060101ALN20080624BHEP

2008-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A MOLYBDENUM COMPOUND TO REDUCE MICROPITTING AND A LUBRICATING COMPOSITION

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFTON CHEMICAL LIMITED

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI