Global patent index - EP 0949366 A3

EP 0949366 A3 2001-01-10 - Apparatus for clamping an underwound yarn wrap on the spindle of a ring spinning or ring twisting machine

Title (en)

Apparatus for clamping an underwound yarn wrap on the spindle of a ring spinning or ring twisting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Klemmen eines Unterwindefadens an der Spindel einer Ringspinnmaschine oder Ringzwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil pour pincer un fil de sous-renvidage sur une broche d'un métier continu à filer ou à retordre à anneau

Publication

EP 0949366 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106597 A

Priority

  • DE 19816205 A
  • DE 19910072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949366A2] An underwinding thread clamping mechanism for a ring spinning or ring twisting machine spindle has sinusoidal interengaging spindle collar and clamping sleeve ends releasable by an actuator (4) used for braking the sleeve with respect to the collar. The apparatus clamps an underwinding thread on a ring spinning or ring twisting machine spindle having, below a fitted bobbin, a fixed collar (2) and an axially displaceable clamping sleeve (3), which can be disconnected by an actuator. The underwinding thread is wrapped by less than 360 degrees around the spindle. Corresponding end faces (10,20) of the collar and the spring-biased rotatable clamping sleeve have interengaging sinusoidal contours over at least part of their circumference and/or diameter. While the actuator is used for braking the sleeve with respect to the collar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/38; B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01); D01H 1/38 (2006.01); D01H 7/04 (2006.01); D01H 7/08 (2006.01); D01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949366 A2 19991013; EP 0949366 A3 20010110; EP 0949366 B1 20030507; JP H11315430 A 19991116; US 6085511 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-04-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905399

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010127

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI