Global Patent Index - EP 0949369 B1

EP 0949369 B1 2002-11-06 - Fiber laminates

Title (en)

Fiber laminates

Title (de)

Faserlaminate

Title (fr)

Laminés à fibres

Publication

EP 0949369 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99302336 A

Priority

GB 9806853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949369A1] This invention relates to carbon fiber fabric reinforced thermoplastic structures and particularly to such structures having high indent resistance and high damage tolerance and to the use of such structures in environments where these properties of high indent resistance and high damage tolerance are required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 15/00; B32B 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 19/06 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 5/26 (2013.01); B32B 5/024 (2013.01); B32B 19/06 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0011 (2013.01); D03D 15/12 (2013.01); B32B 2262/106 (2013.01); D10B 2101/06 (2013.01); D10B 2101/08 (2013.01); D10B 2101/12 (2013.01); D10B 2321/021 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01); D10B 2401/041 (2013.01); D10B 2401/063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949369 A1 19991013; EP 0949369 B1 20021106; DE 69903765 D1 20021212; DE 69903765 T2 20030814; ES 2185292 T3 20030416; GB 9806853 D0 19980527

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185292 T3

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903765 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI