Global Patent Index - EP 0949375 A3

EP 0949375 A3 2000-03-22 - Device for transferring a fibrous web

Title (en)

Device for transferring a fibrous web

Title (de)

Übergabe einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transférer une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 0949375 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105219 A

Priority

DE 19815994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949375A2] During transfer of the strip (2) of the fibrous band (1), at the region of transfer (5), suction is applied. Suction is also applied in the separation region (6) immediately following. An Independent claim is included for equipment as described, in which the region of suction can be moved with respect to the transition region, preferably by turning. PREFERRED FEATURES:- Especially with bands (3,4) first meeting in the transition zone (5), the transferred band (4) is subjected to suction just before the transition. Air is blown against the materials from the opposite side. In the equipment, separate suction zones may be included; further variants are described. The suction zone is supplied with compressed air. It can be formed by a rotating perforated roller. Sliding surfaces seal the edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 2/00; D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/10 (2006.01); B65H 20/12 (2006.01); D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21G 9/0063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949375 A2 19991013; EP 0949375 A3 20000322; EP 0949375 B1 20040616; EP 0949375 B9 20041222; CA 2268528 A1 19991009; DE 19815994 A1 19991014; JP H11314817 A 19991116; US 6336996 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-03-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070313

2006-03-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909715 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-11-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSFERRING A FIBROUS WEB

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI