Global Patent Index - EP 0949381 A3

EP 0949381 A3 2000-12-20 - Noise reduction wall for road traffic

Title (en)

Noise reduction wall for road traffic

Title (de)

Schallschutzwand für Verkehrswege

Title (fr)

Mur anti-bruit pour voie de circulation

Publication

EP 0949381 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105441 A

Priority

DE 29805730 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949381A2] The sound proof wall has a supporting structure supported from the floor which is attached to a sound absorbing wall portion. The supporting construction is manufactured so that it encompassed a vertical frame (11), in which the wall element (20) is inserted. The wall element consists partly of recycled material and/or waste products. The frame may have similar sized cassette openings (12) which may be inserted in the wall part with a gripping part (21). The gripping part may be situated in the positively locking cassette opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/0035 (2013.01); E01F 8/0017 (2013.01); E01F 8/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805730 U1 19980604; EP 0949381 A2 19991013; EP 0949381 A3 20001220; PL 332262 A1 19991011

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010609

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI