Global Patent Index - EP 0949382 A3

EP 0949382 A3 2001-01-17 - Wall elements for a noise barrier and noise barrier

Title (en)

Wall elements for a noise barrier and noise barrier

Title (de)

Wandelement für eine Lärmschutzwand und Lärmschutzwand

Title (fr)

Elements de mur anti-bruit et mur anti-bruit

Publication

EP 0949382 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107018 A

Priority

DE 19816089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949382A2] Each element (1) comprises two opposing parallel wall panels (2,3) joined together along two opposing panel edges (4-7) by two profiled strips (8,9). Spring fittings (10-13) integrally formed from the strips lock into undercut length direction grooves (14-17) formed by the strips. An Independent claim is also included for a noise barrier constructed from these wall elements, connected together by H-profile posts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949382 A2 19991013; EP 0949382 A3 20010117; DE 19816089 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI