Global Patent Index - EP 0949386 A3

EP 0949386 A3 2000-11-15 - Multi-part wall-tie

Title (en)

Multi-part wall-tie

Title (de)

Mehrteiliger Maueranker

Title (fr)

Entretoise composée de plusieurs éléments

Publication

EP 0949386 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201057 A

Priority

  • NL 1008848 A
  • NL 1011079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949386A2] The invention relates to a multi-part wall tie comprising an inner wall tie to be received in an inner cavity wall and an outer wall tie to be coupled to the inner wall tie and to be received in an outer cavity wall. The inner wall tie is an assembly comprising a wall plug and a prick tie forming a straight tie pin, or a planar moulded portion to be received in the inner wall and joined or connectable thereto, an essentially straight tie pin projecting from the inner wall, the outer wall tie being mounted substantially in the extended direction onto the tie pin, which outer wall tie comprises a substantially planar tie element which is suitable to be received and tied into the outer cavity wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/30; E04B 1/41; E04B 2/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4178 (2013.01); E04B 1/4185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949386 A2 19991013; EP 0949386 A3 20001115; NL 1011079 C1 19991011

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE NL

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/30 A, 7E 04B 2/44 B, 7E 04B 1/41 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI