Global Patent Index - EP 0949398 A3

EP 0949398 A3 2001-03-28 - Vertical lift gate for closing a door opening of a cold room

Title (en)

Vertical lift gate for closing a door opening of a cold room

Title (de)

Hubtor für den Abschluss einer Toröffnung eines Tiefkühl-Lagerraumes

Title (fr)

Porte relevable pour la fermeture de l'ouverture de la porte d'une chambre froide

Publication

EP 0949398 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117345 A

Priority

DE 19815431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949398A2] The door has wheels at the upper and lower ends running in pairs of guide rails on each side and raised and lowered by bands wound on drums on a motor driven shaft. Thermal seals at the four edges of the door are released by the profile of the guide rails. There are winding drums (12) for bands (14) holding counterweights (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/20; E04F 15/16; E05D 13/00; E05F 15/16; F25D 23/02; F25D 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/20 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); F25D 23/08 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01); F25D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/20 (2013.01); F25D 23/021 (2013.01); F25D 23/087 (2013.01); E05D 13/1207 (2013.01); E05D 13/14 (2013.01); E05F 15/665 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/67 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/102 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01); F25D 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949398 A2 19991013; EP 0949398 A3 20010328; EP 0949398 B1 20031217

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810467

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-06-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-02-11 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: NORBERT, LAMSFUSS

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810467

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADOLF SEUSTER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ADOLF SEUSTER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05D 15/20 A, 7E 05F 15/16 B, 7E 05D 13/00 B, 7F 25D 23/02 B, 7F 25D 23/08 B, 7E 04F 15/16 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI