Global patent index - EP 0949410 A3

EP 0949410 A3 2000-11-02 - Coated transition duct for a gas turbine

Title (en)

Coated transition duct for a gas turbine

Title (de)

Beschichteter Überströmkanal für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Conduit de transition revêtu pour une turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0949410 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103176 A

Priority

DE 19815473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949410A2] A gas turbine hot gas inlet manifold consists of a heat and corrosion resistant metal substrate (9) with interior and exterior high temperature corrosion and oxidation protective layers (4). The metal substrate consists of a nickel base alloy and the high temperature corrosion and oxidation protective layers consist of MCrAlY containing 31% Cr, 11% Al and 0.6% Y.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02C 7/30; F01D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/023 (2013.01); C23C 28/3215 (2013.01); C23C 28/325 (2013.01); C23C 28/3455 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01); F05D 2230/90 (2013.01); F05D 2300/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949410 A2 19991013; EP 0949410 A3 20001102; EP 0949410 B1 20030716; CA 2263834 A1 19991007; CA 2263834 C 20041019; CN 1143056 C 20040324; CN 1231384 A 19991013; DE 19815473 A1 19991014; JP 3823282 B2 20060920; JP H11336563 A 19991207; US 6226978 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59906280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110325

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHANDRA, SHARAD DR.-ING.

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ELLERMANN, BERTHOLD DIPL.-ING.

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GATHMANN, HEINZ DIPL.-ING.

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHNIEDERS, WERNER DIPL.-ING.

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG GHH BORSIG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI