Global Patent Index - EP 0949417 A3

EP 0949417 A3 2000-06-14 - Compressor with combined pressure sensor and high pressure relief valve assembly

Title (en)

Compressor with combined pressure sensor and high pressure relief valve assembly

Title (de)

Kompressor mit kombiniertem Drucksensor und Druckausgleichsventil

Title (fr)

Compresseur avec détecteur et soupape de compensation de pression combiné

Publication

EP 0949417 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200757 A

Priority

US 5717998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949417A2] A combined compressor pressure sensor and excess pressure relief valve (12) uses a formed disk (22) that snaps down and back up at a pair of predetermined pressures. The disk 922), when it snaps down, opens a plug (34) to in turn allow excess pressure from the compressor (10) to escape. When up, the plug (34) remains sealed, the outside vents (42) remain blocked, and compressor gas flow only through the center of the plug (34) and disk (22) to a sensing chamber (46). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/10; F04B 39/00; F16K 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 17/02 (2006.01); F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04B 39/10 (2006.01); F16K 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2013.01); F04B 39/1013 (2013.01); F16K 17/0493 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7836 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7929 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949417 A2 19991013; EP 0949417 A3 20000614; EP 0949417 B1 20041201; DE 69922287 D1 20050105; DE 69922287 T2 20051201; JP 3026971 B2 20000327; JP H11315944 A 19991116; US 5984645 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090312

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090312

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922287 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 39/10 A, 7F 04B 39/00 B, 7F 16K 17/04 B

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI