Global Patent Index - EP 0949452 A3

EP 0949452 A3 2000-09-20 - Radiant burner

Title (en)

Radiant burner

Title (de)

Strahlungsbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur radiant

Publication

EP 0949452 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106733 A

Priority

DE 19815785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949452A2] The burner (1) comprises a casing (2) connected to a fuel and air supply line (8) and enclosing at least one side of a mixing region (9) for the fuel and air. A preferably ceramic burner plate (11) is provided in the underside of the casing. A radiant heat emitter (24) is spaced from the burner plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/12; F23D 14/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/12 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/825 (2013.01); F23D 14/12 (2013.01); F23D 2212/10 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14001 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949452 A2 19991013; EP 0949452 A3 20000920; DE 19815785 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI