Global Patent Index - EP 0949479 B1

EP 0949479 B1 2002-09-18 - Semiconductor igniter

Title (en)

Semiconductor igniter

Title (de)

Halbleiterzünder

Title (fr)

Allumeur semiconducteur

Publication

EP 0949479 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106969 A

Priority

DE 19815928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949479A1] The igniter has a thermal insulation layer (104) which is limited to the ignition gap region (108) of a semiconductor layer (106). The semiconductor layer, at its end sections (110,112) held free from the thermal insulating layer, is connected fixed with a carrier (102). The semiconductor layer, is heated, with current passing in the ignition gap region, to trigger the ignition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/26 (2006.01); F42B 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949479 A1 19991013; EP 0949479 B1 20020918; AT 224529 T 20021015; DE 19815928 A1 19991104; DE 19815928 C2 20000511; ES 2181330 T3 20030216; JP 2000028298 A 20000128; US 6220164 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060409

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050411

2006-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060409

2006-04-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050410

2005-04-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181330 T3

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224529 T 20021015

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2000-08-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991218

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI