Global patent index - EP 0949644 A3

EP 0949644 A3 2000-05-10 - Timer particularly for household appliances

Title (en)

Timer particularly for household appliances

Title (de)

Zeitschalter, insbesondere für Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Minuterie, en particulier pour appareils ménagers

Publication

EP 0949644 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99106131 A

Priority

IT PD980084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949644A2] A timer particularly for household appliances which comprises an electronic printed circuit (10) constituting the supporting base for electromechanical components which comprise a driving motor (11) which is kinematically connected to a rotating cam (24) which constitutes the selector of a plurality of contacts (29) which are rigidly coupled to the printed circuit, with which it is operatively associated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 43/005 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5888 (2013.01); H01H 2043/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949644 A2 19991013; EP 0949644 A3 20000510; IT PD980084 A1 19991011

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-01-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20001102

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI