Global Patent Index - EP 0949646 A3

EP 0949646 A3 2000-04-26 - Accessory device for a magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (en)

Accessory device for a magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (de)

Zusatzgerät für thermomagnetischer Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif annexe pour disjoncteur magnéto-thermique

Publication

EP 0949646 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200908 A

Priority

IT MI980606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949646A2] An accessory device for indicating the state of a magnetothermal circuit breaker, particularly of the bipolar type with phase and neutral poles, which is associated therewith, comprising an insulating casing which contains fixed contacts and a corresponding moving contact and connection terminals. The peculiarity of the device consists in that it comprises: a) a kinematic mechanism which comprises: means for coupling to the circuit breaker; means for actuating the moving contact; means for the local visual indication of a triggered circuit breaker state; b) a mechanism for testing the device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/46; H01H 71/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/04 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/462 (2013.01); H01H 71/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949646 A2 19991013; EP 0949646 A3 20000426; EP 0949646 B1 20050126; AT 288128 T 20050215; DE 69923363 D1 20050303; DE 69923363 T2 20060323; IT 1298785 B1 20000202; IT MI980606 A1 19990924

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ABB SACE S.P.A.

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923363 P 20050303

2005-02-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB SACE S.P.A.

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI