Global Patent Index - EP 0949721 B1

EP 0949721 B1 2003-06-11 - Pluggable and lockable monopole connector

Title (en)

Pluggable and lockable monopole connector

Title (de)

Einsteckbarer und verriegelbarer einpoliger Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur monopolaire enfichable et verrouillable

Publication

EP 0949721 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99104344 A

Priority

  • EP 99104344 A
  • EP 98400552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949721A1] A monopole electrical connector (4) for interconnecting a conductor such as a cable to a structure for ground or power connection, comprises a receptacle portion mountable over a stud (8) having transverse locking protrusions (13). A locking ring (32) is resiliently and rotatably assembled to the connector housing (14), and comprises a camming slot (52) engaging the locking studs (13) of the mating connector (6). The oblique camming portion (52) of the camming slot ensures that unless complete coupling of the connectors has occurred, the connectors are biased to an uncoupled and electrically disconnected state. In the fully coupled state, a transverse locking portion (54) of the camming slot (50) engages the locking protrusions (13) of the mating connector thereby securely locking the connectors together. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00; H01R 13/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/213 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/28 (2013.01); H01R 13/213 (2013.01); H01R 24/20 (2013.01); H01R 24/66 (2013.01); H01R 2101/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949721 A1 19991013; EP 0949721 B1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908696 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/00 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/213 B

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI