Global Patent Index - EP 0949723 B1

EP 0949723 B1 2002-11-27 - Electrical hermaphroditic safety connector

Title (en)

Electrical hermaphroditic safety connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer hermaphroditischer Sicherheitssteckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique hermaphrodite de sécurité

Publication

EP 0949723 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400853 A

Priority

FR 9804455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949723A1] The connector has two identical sections (1,1') each having a central connector pin (17,17') and contact protecting obscuration shutter. The protection shutters (51,51') slide forward when the connector is released, preventing arcing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/18; H01R 13/453

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 24/84 (2011.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2013.01); H01R 24/84 (2013.01); H01R 13/6275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949723 A1 19991013; EP 0949723 B1 20021127; DE 69904100 D1 20030109; DE 69904100 T2 20030717; ES 2188104 T3 20030616; FR 2777391 A1 19991015; FR 2777391 B1 20000623; US 6109938 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-01 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20120426

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARRIER KHEOPS BAC

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-06 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-04-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060409

2005-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188104 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904100 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 24/18 A, 7H 01R 13/453 B

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011123

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI