Global Patent Index - EP 0949852 A3

EP 0949852 A3 2001-04-11 - Discharge lamp operating circuit with selectable operating conditions

Title (en)

Discharge lamp operating circuit with selectable operating conditions

Title (de)

Betriebsschaltung für Entladungslampen mit umschaltbaren Betriebszuständen

Title (fr)

Circuit d'alimentation de lampes à décharge avec sélection de mode de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 0949852 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105264 A

Priority

DE 19815624 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0949852A2] The operating circuit has an electrolytic capacitor (C1) which is connected to a flip flop (SP) and this responds to turn off the power for a specific interval. The output signal (SPA) is independent of the interruption. The flip-flop is coupled to a reset device (SS) that is a conventional lock out device. Voltage limiting is provided by a Zener diode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01); H05B 41/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0949852 A2 19991013; EP 0949852 A3 20010411; CA 2267486 A1 19991007; CN 1146307 C 20040414; CN 1231574 A 19991013; DE 19815624 A1 19991014; JP H11329778 A 19991130; KR 19990082996 A 19991125; US 6181074 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050310

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI