Global patent index - EP 0949933 A4

EP 0949933 A4 2001-01-10 - USE OF CYANOACRYLATE ADHESIVES FOR PROVIDING A PROTECTIVE BARRIER FILM FOR THE SKIN

Title (en)

USE OF CYANOACRYLATE ADHESIVES FOR PROVIDING A PROTECTIVE BARRIER FILM FOR THE SKIN

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON CYANOACRYLATKLEBERN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHUTZFILMS FÜR DIE HAUT

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ADHESIFS AU CYANOACRYLATE POUR PRODUIRE UN FILM BARRIERE PROTECTEUR POUR LA PEAU

Publication

EP 0949933 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96925489 A

Priority

US 9612239 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2263460A1] A cyanoacrylate adhesive is applied onto skin area prone to exposure to discharge by patients suffering from incontinence so as to shield the skin from direct contact with the discharge. The adhesive can also be applied over medicant that has been applied onto skin surface and onto skin along the periphery of a stoma.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 25/00; A61K 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 6598696 A 19980220; CA 2263460 A1 19980205; EP 0949933 A1 19991020; EP 0949933 A4 20010110

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLOWERS PARK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990215;LT PAYMENT 19990215;LV PAYMENT 19990215;SI PAYMENT 19990215