Global Patent Index - EP 0950060 A4

EP 0950060 A4 2000-07-05 - ANTISENSE INHIBITION OF HUMAN ADHESION MOLECULES

Title (en)

ANTISENSE INHIBITION OF HUMAN ADHESION MOLECULES

Title (de)

GEGENSTRANG-HEMMUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN ADHÄSIONSMOLEKÜLEN

Title (fr)

INHIBITION ANTISENS DE MOLECULES D'ADHESION HUMAINES

Publication

EP 0950060 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96945380 A

Priority

US 9619194 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824797A1] The present invention provides a method for the treatment of human conditions and diseases that have an inflammatory component, including but not limited to acne, psoriasis, arthritis, transplanted organ rejection, wounds, burns, septic shock and inflammatory complications of shock. A process for selectively inhibiting the expression of the human ICAM-I, human E-selectin, or human VCAM-1 mRNA transcripts using at least one oligonucleotide which is complementary to at least a portion of the human ICAM-I, human E-selectin, or human VCAM-1 mRNAs is disclosed, as are oligonucleotides which are complementary to portions of the ICAM-I, human E-selectin, or human VCAM-1 mRNAs and compositions comprising the aforementioned oligonucleotides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1138 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9615780 A1 19960530 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9422488 A1 19941013 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9301286 A2 19930121 - MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]
  • [E] US 5580969 A 19961203 - HOKE GLENN D [US], et al
  • [DX] LEE CH. ET AL.: "Antisense gene suppression against human ICAM-1, ELAM-1, and VCAM-1 in cultured human umbilical vein endothelial cells.", SHOCK 1995 JUL;4(1):1-10, XP000892942
  • [X] BENNETT C F ET AL: "INHIBITION OF ICAM-1, VCAM-1 AND E-SELECTIN EXPRESSION WITH ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY. SUPPLEMENT, 9 January 1993 (1993-01-09), pages 354, XP000647853
  • See also references of WO 9824797A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824797 A1 19980611; AU 1564897 A 19980629; CA 2273203 A1 19980611; EP 0950060 A1 19991020; EP 0950060 A4 20000705; JP 2001505432 A 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040716

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE