Global patent index - EP 0950076 A4

EP 0950076 A4 2000-09-13 - FLAME RESISTANT NYLON ELASTOMERS

Title (en)

FLAME RESISTANT NYLON ELASTOMERS

Title (de)

FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE NYLON ELASTOMERE

Title (fr)

ELASTOMERES DE NYLON IGNIFUGES

Publication

EP 0950076 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98903616 A

Priority

  • US 9801122 W
  • US 77855097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9829492A1] A flame retardant nylon elastomer composition comprising a nylon elastomer and an effective amount of the following ingredients in mixture thereof: (1) a flame-retardant comprising a halogenated aromatic compound; (2) antimony oxide; and (3) a particulate inorganic compound. The nylon elastomers are characterized with a UL 94 V-0 rating, and an increased limiting oxygen index.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08K 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 77/12 (2006.01); C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/02 (2006.01); C08K 5/03 (2006.01); C08K 5/06 (2006.01); C08K 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/06 (2013.01); C08K 3/2279 (2013.01); C08K 5/005 (2013.01); C08K 5/02 (2013.01); C08K 7/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 3/2279 + C08L 77/00
  2. C08K 5/005 + C08L 77/00
  3. C08K 5/02 + C08L 77/00
  4. C08K 5/06 + C08L 77/00
  5. C08K 7/16 + C08L 77/00

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9516737 A1 19950622 - DU PONT [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 08 29 September 1995 (1995-09-29)
  • See also references of WO 9829492A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9829492 A1 19980709; CA 2277081 A1 19980709; EP 0950076 A1 19991020; EP 0950076 A4 20000913; JP 2001507746 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-20 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001015

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08K 5/05 A, 7C 08K 13/02 B, 7C 08L 77/10 B, 7C 08K 13/02 J, 7C 08K 3:22 J, 7C 08K 5:03 J, 7C 08K 3:02 J

2000-09-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL