Global Patent Index - EP 0950213 B1

EP 0950213 B1 2002-12-18 - Large size calendar date indicating mechnism for watch or small clock movements and movement incorporating the same

Title (en)

Large size calendar date indicating mechnism for watch or small clock movements and movement incorporating the same

Title (de)

Datumsgrossanzeigemechanismus für Uhren- und Pendeluhrwerke und mit einem solchen Mechanismus versehenes Uhrwerk

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'affichage du quantième de grand format pour mouvements de montres et pendulettes et mouvement d'horlogerie l'incorporant

Publication

EP 0950213 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941206 A

Priority

  • CH 9800390 W
  • CH 214897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913383A1] A. Description: a) a cambered toothed ring (1) of 31 more or less long and high slots are urged to replace the initial date ring; b) an 8-toothed star (10) topped with a disk (11) is used for indicating the tens of the month through an open window (16) in the dial (15); c) a 10-toothed star (7) topped with a disk (8) is used to indicate the units of the month through an open window (16) in the dial (15). d) a spring cam jumper (13) maintains the stars in position; e) a main plate (5) of the movement diameter is urged to be fixed on the watch movement to assemble together the whole set of said components. B. Function mode: a) the toothed ring (1) rotates completely in 31 days; b) the cambered slots of said ring drive each star forward by one tooth at a time; c) the stars co-operate with the ring each at a different level; d) when a slot is shorter or less high, it doe not drive the star and the latter stays put; e) such that the ring is programmed for the disks to indicate through the dial the days of the month from 1 to 31 and automatically shift from 31 to 1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/253 (2006.01); G04B 19/247 (2006.01); G04C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/247 (2013.01); G04C 17/0066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913383 A1 19990318; AT 230127 T 20030115; CA 2271999 A1 19990318; DE 69810261 D1 20030130; DE 69810261 T2 20031106; EA 001013 B1 20000828; EA 199900455 A1 19991229; EP 0950213 A1 19991020; EP 0950213 B1 20021218; ES 2190097 T3 20030716; HK 1025637 A1 20030613; JP 2000511290 A 20000829; JP 3390021 B2 20030324

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150911

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150910

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150910

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150910

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810261

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A., CH

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. *RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL10, ROUTE DES BICHES,

- Effective date: 20051124

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: S.A. *RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20051124

2006-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-03-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-03-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MANUFACTURE LA JOUX-PERRET SA

2005-12-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANUFACTURE LA JOUX-PERRET SA

- Free text: JAQUET S.A.#RUE DU COLLEGE 85#2300 LA CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MANUFACTURE LA JOUX-PERRET SA#RUE DU COLLEGE 85#2302 LA CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH)

2005-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Free text: MANUFACTURE LA JOUX-PERRET SA#RUE DU COLLEGE 85#2302 LA CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.#10, ROUTE DES BICHES#1752 VILLARS-SUR-GLANE (CH)

2005-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. *RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL10, ROUTE DES BICHES,

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: S.A. *RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20051124

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0950213E

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190097 T3

2003-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GLN GRESSET & LAESSER NEUCHATEL CABINET DE CONSEIL

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810261 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810261 P 20030130

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230127 T 20030115

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LARGE SIZE CALENDAR DATE INDICATING MECHNISM FOR WATCH OR SMALL CLOCK MOVEMENTS AND MOVEMENT INCORPORATING THE SAME

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990629

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE