Global Patent Index - EP 0950254 A4

EP 0950254 A4 2002-11-27 - AN ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE CONTAINING A PROTECTION LAYER

Title (en)

AN ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE CONTAINING A PROTECTION LAYER

Title (de)

ORGANISCHES LICHTEMITTIERENDES BAUELEMENT MIT EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ORGANIQUE LUMINESCENT CONTENANT UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0950254 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97953470 A

Priority

  • US 9723952 W
  • US 77411996 A
  • US 77412096 A
  • US 77233296 A
  • US 77181596 A
  • US 81497697 A
  • US 82138097 A
  • US 83809997 A
  • US 85026497 A
  • US 86549197 A
  • US 92540397 A
  • US 92880097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828767A1] The present invention is directed to organic light emitting devices comprised of a heterostructure for producing electroluminescence, wherein the heterostructure includes a protection layer between a hole transporting layer and an indium tin oxide anode layer. The hole injection enhancement layer may be comprised of 3,4,9,10-perylenetetracarboxylic dianhydride (PTCDA), bis(1,2,5-thiadiazolo)-p-quinobis(1,3-dithiole) (BTQBT), or other suitable, rigid organic materials. The present invention is further directed to methods of fabricating such devices, wherein the devices may include alternative combinations of materials for each of the layers included in the devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 51/20; H05B 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/06 (2006.01); H01L 51/30 (2006.01); H01L 51/50 (2006.01); H01L 51/52 (2006.01); H05B 33/02 (2006.01); H05B 33/10 (2006.01); H05B 33/12 (2006.01); H01L 27/32 (2006.01); H01L 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/5271 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); H01L 51/0021 (2013.01); H01L 51/0053 (2013.01); H01L 51/0081 (2013.01); H01L 51/0082 (2013.01); H01L 51/5088 (2013.01); H01L 27/3209 (2013.01); H01L 51/0046 (2013.01); H01L 51/5206 (2013.01); H01L 51/5284 (2013.01); H01L 2251/308 (2013.01); H01L 2251/5315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5118986 A 19920602 - OHNUMA TERUYUKI [JP], et al
  • [X] WO 9403030 A1 19940203 - CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH [GB], et al
  • [E] WO 9810473 A1 19980312 - CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH [GB], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199434, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E14, AN 1994-274360, XP002203185
  • See also references of WO 9828767A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828767 A1 19980702; CA 2275542 A1 19980702; CN 1245581 A 20000223; EP 0950254 A1 19991020; EP 0950254 A4 20021127; JP 2001527688 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-11-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 51/20 A, 7H 05B 33/14 B

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990616;LT PAYMENT 19990616;LV PAYMENT 19990616;MK PAYMENT 19990616;RO PAYMENT 19990616;SI PAYMENT 19990616