Global patent index - EP 0950390 A3

EP 0950390 A3 2000-01-05 - Apparatus for relieving back pain

Title (en)

Apparatus for relieving back pain

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verminderung von Rückenschmerzen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour soulager les douleurs dorsales

Publication

EP 0950390 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99106226 A

Priority

US 5919698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950390A2] A portable seat supportable apparatus for relieving lower back pressure of a user is provided. In one embodiment, the seat supportable apparatus includes a back portion having a rib cage engagement assembly connected thereto, the rib cage engagement assembly removably engaging the rib cage of the user when he is sitting on the bottom portion, and user controlled elevating apparatus for selectably elevating the rib cage assembly, thereby to relieve lower back pressure of the user. In a further embodiment, the seat supportable apparatus includes a bottom portion for placing on a seat, the bottom portion for seating the user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 1/0292 (2013.01); A61H 1/0218 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1621 (2013.01); A61H 2203/0431 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950390 A2 19991020; EP 0950390 A3 20000105; IL 129402 D0 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2001-01-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20001201

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI