Global Patent Index - EP 0950428 A3

EP 0950428 A3 2001-01-03 - Improved doll producing catarrh simulating effects

Title (en)

Improved doll producing catarrh simulating effects

Title (de)

Puppe die den Schleimfluss nachahmt

Title (fr)

Poupée imitant des effets catarrheux

Publication

EP 0950428 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500275 A

Priority

ES 9800530 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950428A2] It has the particularity that it allows the emitting of elongated bodies (8) which simulate nasal secretions, through the nasal fossas of the nose (7) when the doll is in vertical position thanks to the action of a plastic body which has a metallic counterweight (11), being it possible to move the tongue (13) by means of a pacifier, a feeding bottle nipple or a toy thermometer of the adequate size. The doll can also make sounds resembling sneezing and weeping when a push button (5) located at the belly is grazed or air is introduced inside the doll by external means such a toy syringe through the holes (2) located at several spots of the doll, such as the arms (6) or the buttocks. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/24; A63H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950428 A2 19991020; EP 0950428 A3 20010103; ES 1039625 U 19990101; ES 1039625 Y 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010130

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63H 3/24 A, 7A 63H 3/00 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI