Global Patent Index - EP 0950442 A3

EP 0950442 A3 2001-01-24 - Device for cutting wire windings

Title (en)

Device for cutting wire windings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Drahtwindungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupage de spires de fil

Publication

EP 0950442 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107136 A

Priority

DE 19817035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950442A2] A heated wire (2a,b) is continually formed to a precise diameter into a helical shape by a die former (1) and a pair of arc-shaped separators (4a,b) are moved cyclically by an electric motor (8) and gearbox (10) to isolate a coil which is sheared by cutters (5a,b) similarly moved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01); B21F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/26 (2013.01); B21C 47/14 (2013.01); B21C 47/143 (2013.01); Y10S 83/907 (2013.01); Y10T 83/222 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4594 (2015.04); Y10T 83/533 (2015.04); Y10T 83/543 (2015.04); Y10T 83/566 (2015.04); Y10T 83/748 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8802 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8805 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950442 A2 19991020; EP 0950442 A3 20010124; DE 19817035 A1 19991021; JP H11333518 A 19991207; US 6196100 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH CY DK ES LI

2001-11-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-10-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990413

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI