Global Patent Index - EP 0950444 B1

EP 0950444 B1 2002-09-11 - Corner joining machine

Title (en)

Corner joining machine

Title (de)

Eckverbindermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à joindre des coins

Publication

EP 0950444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101514 A

Priority

  • EP 98101514 A
  • CA 2230361 A
  • DE 19700604 A
  • RU 98101505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19700604A1] The machine has a key with an angle groove for location on the frame corner and two drivable stamp dies. The stamp dies (5) with their drive units (23) are movable parallel to the mitring line which runs in the mitring plane (8). A locator (10) accommodates the frame corners and is adjustable independently of the stamp die vertically to the frame plane. The locator for the frame corners forms an assembly with the key (15) and the key is height-adjustably arranged on the locator. The stamp dies with their drive units are located on a control slide (24), the central line (8a) of which is located in the mitring plane. The control slide can be moved along the central line and secured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/14 (2006.01); B21D 53/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/745 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19700604 A1 19980716; DE 19700604 B4 20050811; AT 223769 T 20020915; CA 2230361 A1 19990824; CA 2230361 C 20060418; EP 0950444 A1 19991020; EP 0950444 B1 20020911; RU 2196656 C2 20030120

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170129

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170129

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170129

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170129

2017-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223769 T

- Effective date: 20170129

2017-09-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223769 T 20020915

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2000-08-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI