Global Patent Index - EP 0950483 A3

EP 0950483 A3 2000-09-06 - Loading device for a ceramic press

Title (en)

Loading device for a ceramic press

Title (de)

Füllungsvorrichtung in einer Presse für keramischen Werkstoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation dans une presse pour matière céramique

Publication

EP 0950483 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107573 A

Priority

IT MO980084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950483A2] A loading device (6) for a ceramic press (1) comprises a feeding means (10) capable of feeding at least two types of ceramic material in powder, granules or flakes into a containment means (18, 18a, 18b) containing said ceramic material which is able to move between a loading position in which it receives said ceramic material from said feeding means (10) and an unloading position in which it transfers said material to said press (1), and a transfer means (8) for transferring said containment means (18, 18a, 18b) to said unloading position, said containment means (18, 18a, 18b) being capable of rotating in a plane substantially perpendicular to said loading plane. The loading method comprises introducing at least a first type and a second type of ceramic material by gravity into said containment means (18, 18a, 18b), placing it in at least a first layer and at least a second layer, one above the other, transferring said containment means (18) to a position for unloading the material into a press (1), and subjecting said containment means (18, 18a, 18b) to a rotation in a plane perpendicular to the press loading plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02; B28B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/304 (2013.01); B28B 13/022 (2013.01); B28B 13/0245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 0940235 A2 19990908 - MARAZZI GRUPPO CERAMICHE S P A [IT]
  • [A] EP 0822044 A1 19980204 - CERAMICHE DUAL S R L [IT], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 07 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950483 A2 19991020; EP 0950483 A3 20000906; IT 1304615 B1 20010328; IT MO980084 A1 19991015

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI