Global patent index - EP 0950604 A3

EP 0950604 A3 2000-07-12 - Building element for the construction of walls and/or ceilings, especially on ships

Title (en)

Building element for the construction of walls and/or ceilings, especially on ships

Title (de)

Bauelement zur Erstellung von Wänden und/oder Decken, insbesondere auf Schiffen

Title (fr)

Elément de construction pour la réalisation de murs et/ou de plafonds, en particulier sur des bateaux

Publication

EP 0950604 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112927 A

Priority

  • DE 29806157 U
  • DE 29807049 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950604A2] The constructional component (100) is made of a multiple layer panel (150) with a rectangular shape (151) having a mineral wool inner layer (155) with fibres extending perpendicular to the cover surface. The mineral wool layer is covered at each side with wall panels (40,41) which are glued to it. The rear face of the panel has a U-shaped rail (20,20') with profiled shanks (21,22) extending out and laterally of the panel longitudinal axis through angled shank sections (21a,22a;21'a,22'a). Each shank has a slit in the direction of the thickness of each wall panel to receive connectors (200,300,400,500).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/02; E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04C 2/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2013.01); E04B 2/7453 (2013.01); E04C 2/384 (2013.01); E04B 2/7411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950604 A2 19991020; EP 0950604 A3 20000712

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/74 A, 7B 63B 3/68 B, 7E 04C 2/38 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI